IA HSB41 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HJR5
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa that the Constitution of the State of Iowa does not recognize, grant, or secure a right to abortion or require the public funding of abortion.(See HJR 5.)
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa that the Constitution of the State of Iowa does not recognize, grant, or secure a right to abortion or require the public funding of abortion.(See HJR 5.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 5. |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 178. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 178. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 9:00AM Law Library. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 8:00AM Law Library. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Osmundson and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 88. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 86. |
2021-01-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HJR5 (Replaced by) 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.