IA HSB35 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF251
Note: Legislation replaced by SF260
Note: Legislation replaced by SF260
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 179.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 179.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the liability of possessors and occupants of land for injury to trespassers and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the liability of possessors and occupants of land for injury to trespassers and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 179. |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2017 9:30AM House Lounge |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Hinson, Heartsill and Olson. H.J. 110. |
2017-01-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1011 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF251 (Replaced by) 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 960.
SF260 (Replaced by) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
HF251 (Replaced by) 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 960.
SF260 (Replaced by) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB35 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB35.html |