IA HSB268 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF797
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 797.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 797.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to benefits concerning members of the municipal fire and police retirement system.(See HF 797.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to benefits concerning members of the municipal fire and police retirement system.(See HF 797.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 797. |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 603. |
2021-03-03 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Jones and Mascher. H.J. 592. |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 591. |
2021-03-03 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF797 (Replaced by) 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB268 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB268.html |