IA HSB266 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF791
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 791.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 791.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public records including confidentiality, access, and the enforcement of public records violations, and uniform commercial code filings; certain employment matters including benefits, workers' compensation, civil actions, and civil immunity; and law enforcement including law enforcement officer rights, eluding law enforcement, and carrying firearms; and providing penalties.(See HF 791.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to public records including confidentiality, access, and the enforcement of public records violations, and uniform commercial code filings; certain employment matters including benefits, workers' compensation, civil actions, and civil immunity; and law enforcement including law enforcement officer rights, eluding law enforcement, and carrying firearms; and providing penalties.(See HF 791.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 791. |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 601. |
2021-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2021 8:00AM RM 19. |
2021-03-02 | House | Subcommittee: Klein, Steckman and Westrich. H.J. 567. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 566. |
2021-03-02 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF791 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB266 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB266.html |