IA HSB258 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF802

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 802.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for requirements related to racism or sexism trainings at, and diversity and inclusion efforts by, school districts and public postsecondary educational institutions.(See HF 802.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for requirements related to racism or sexism trainings at, and diversity and inclusion efforts by, school districts and public postsecondary educational institutions.(See HF 802.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 802.
2021-03-05HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 614.
2021-03-02HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
2021-02-26HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2021 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
2021-02-25HouseSubcommittee: Holt, Wheeler and Wolfe. H.J. 557.
2021-02-25HouseIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 555.
2021-02-25HouseBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HF802 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback