IA HSB254 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF535
Note: Legislation replaced by HF756

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 756.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the acquisition and possession of weapons and providing penalties.(See HF 756.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the acquisition and possession of weapons and providing penalties.(See HF 756.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 756.
2021-03-02HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 570.
2021-03-02HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
2021-02-25HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2021 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
2021-02-25HouseSubcommittee: Holt, Klein and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 556.
2021-02-25HouseIntroduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 555.
2021-02-25HouseBy COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY

Same As/Similar To

SSB1232 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 535.
SF535 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 654.
HF756 (Replaced by) 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback