IA HSB251 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF562
Note: Legislation replaced by HF727

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 727.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, including by providing for payments associated with indigent defense and representation, the funding of activities relating to consumer fraud and antitrust, a corrections capital reinvestment fund, an Iowa law enforcement academy study, a human trafficking study, and the funding of peace officer retirement, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 727.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, including by providing for payments associated with indigent defense and representation, the funding of activities relating to consumer fraud and antitrust, a corrections capital reinvestment fund, an Iowa law enforcement academy study, a human trafficking study, and the funding of peace officer retirement, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 727.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 727.
2023-05-02HouseNOBA: House Sub
2023-05-02HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1016.
2023-05-02HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-05-01HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 05/02/2023 8:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
2023-04-30HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 05/01/2023 9:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled).
2023-04-28HouseSubcommittee: Lohse, Mohr, G. and Wilburn. H.J. 954.
2023-04-28HouseIntroduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 953.
2023-04-28HouseBy COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS

Same As/Similar To

SSB1214 (Related) 2023-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 562.
SF562 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
HF727 (Replaced by) 2023-05-03 - NOBA: House Full Approps

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback