IA HSB251 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF757
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 757.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 757.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to driver's license restrictions, including ignition interlock device requirements for a first operating-while-intoxicated offense.(See HF 757.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to driver's license restrictions, including ignition interlock device requirements for a first operating-while-intoxicated offense.(See HF 757.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 757. |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 570. |
2021-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2021 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2021-02-24 | House | Subcommittee: Andrews, Jeneary and Olson. H.J. 550. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 548. |
2021-02-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF757 (Replaced by) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB251 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB251.html |