IA HSB247 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF722
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2628

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act expanding the sales and use tax exemption allowed for nonprofit blood centers.(See HF 722, HF 2628.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act expanding the sales and use tax exemption allowed for nonprofit blood centers.(See HF 722, HF 2628.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-26HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 722.
2023-04-19HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 887.
2023-04-13HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-04-12HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 04/13/2023 12:30PM House Lounge.
2023-04-12HouseSubcommittee: Bloomingdale, Osmundson and Wilson. H.J. 825.
2023-04-12HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 825.
2023-04-12HouseBy COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS

Same As/Similar To

HF722 (Replaced by) 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 494.
HF2628 (Replaced by) 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee: Koelker, Dawson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 509.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback