IA HSB243 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a student first scholarship program for certain pupils attending nonpublic schools, establishing a student first scholarship fund, providing an income tax exemption, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a student first scholarship program for certain pupils attending nonpublic schools, establishing a student first scholarship fund, providing an income tax exemption, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Wills, Smith and Stone. H.J. 533. |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 531. |
2021-02-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB243 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB243.html |