IA HSB24 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF327
Note: Legislation replaced by HF357

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 357.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to health care employment agencies, health care employment agency workers, and health care entities, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 357.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to health care employment agencies, health care employment agency workers, and health care entities, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 357.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-20HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 357.
2023-02-14HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 309.
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-01-24HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2023 4:30PM House Lounge.
2023-01-18HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 2:00PM House Lounge (Cancelled).
2023-01-12HouseSubcommittee: Wood, Lundgren and Turek. H.J. 97.
2023-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 94.
2023-01-12HouseBy COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Same As/Similar To

SSB1044 (Related) 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 327.
SF327 (Replaced by) 2023-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 937.
HF357 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback