IA HSB234 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF414
Note: Legislation replaced by HF631
Note: Legislation replaced by HF631
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for providing for the creation of first-time homebuyer savings accounts in Iowa, including related individual income tax exemptions, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill for providing for the creation of first-time homebuyer savings accounts in Iowa, including related individual income tax exemptions, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Voted - Ways and Means. |
2015-04-01 | House | 9:00AM; House Lounge Ways and Means. |
2015-03-31 | House | Ways and Means: Windschitl Chair,Hein, and Kelley. |
2015-03-31 | House | In Ways and Means |
2015-03-31 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF414 (Replaced by) 2015-04-01 - Fiscal note. SCS.
SSB1170 (Related) 2015-03-04 - Voted - State Government.
HF631 (Replaced by) 2015-05-12 - Subcommittee, Jochum, Bolkcom, and Smith. S.J. 1017.
SSB1170 (Related) 2015-03-04 - Voted - State Government.
HF631 (Replaced by) 2015-05-12 - Subcommittee, Jochum, Bolkcom, and Smith. S.J. 1017.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB234 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB234.html |