IA HSB228 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF711
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 469.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 469.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a length of service award program for volunteer fire fighters, concerning income tax deductions for volunteer fire fighters, making an appropriation, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a length of service award program for volunteer fire fighters, concerning income tax deductions for volunteer fire fighters, making an appropriation, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 469. |
2019-03-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 2:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-04 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Mohr, G., Kurth and Thorup. H.J. 393. |
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Thorup and Kacena. H.J. 380. |
2019-02-28 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF711 (Replaced by) 2019-04-02 - Fiscal note.
SSB1245 (Related) 2019-03-19 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, R. Smith, and Wahls.
SSB1245 (Related) 2019-03-19 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, R. Smith, and Wahls.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB228 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB228.html |