IA HSB227 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF738
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the regulation of certain commercial establishments engaged in the care of nonagricultural animals, providing for fees, making appropriations and providing for penalties.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the regulation of certain commercial establishments engaged in the care of nonagricultural animals, providing for fees, making appropriations and providing for penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470. |
2019-03-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Hinson and Mascher. H.J. 380. |
2019-02-28 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF738 (Replaced by) 2019-03-19 - Subcommittee: Zumbach, Jacoby and Jones. H.J. 585.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB227 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB227.html |