IA HSB225 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF736
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the time frame applicable to the adjustment of overpayment of claims under the Medicaid program, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 736.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the time frame applicable to the adjustment of overpayment of claims under the Medicaid program, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 736.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 736. |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 568. |
2021-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2021 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee: Boden, Brown-Powers and Moore, T.. H.J. 468. |
2021-02-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 467. |
2021-02-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF736 (Replaced by) 2022-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 876.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB225 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB225.html |