IA HSB210 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF345
Note: Legislation replaced by HF785
Note: Legislation replaced by HF785
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 785.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 785.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to amusement concessions, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 785.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to amusement concessions, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 785.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 785. |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 602. |
2021-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2021 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, Cohoon and Lundgren. H.J. 395. |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 394. |
2021-02-15 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF345 (Replaced by) 2021-02-22 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 10:00AM RM 24A.
HF785 (Replaced by) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
HF785 (Replaced by) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB210 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB210.html |