IA HSB204 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF549
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - Labor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - Labor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to collective bargaining arbitration proceedings involving teachers employed by school districts and area education agencies and including applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill relating to collective bargaining arbitration proceedings involving teachers employed by school districts and area education agencies and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Voted - Labor. |
2015-03-03 | House | 10:00AM; RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber Labor. |
2015-03-02 | House | Labor: Forristall Chair,Taylor, and Watts. |
2015-03-02 | House | In Labor |
2015-03-02 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF549 (Replaced by) 2016-01-12 - Subcommittee, Dearden, Bisignano, and Shipley. S.J. 46.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB204 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB204.html |