IA HSB202 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF555

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 555.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, and providing for administrative penalties.(See HF 555.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, and providing for administrative penalties.(See HF 555.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 555.
2023-02-28HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 472.
2023-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-02-23HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2023 11:00AM House Lounge 2.
2023-02-23HouseSubcommittee: Bergan, Bradley and Forbes. H.J. 418.
2023-02-23HouseIntroduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 416.
2023-02-23HouseBy COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Same As/Similar To

HF555 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback