IA HSB201 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF527
Note: Legislation replaced by SF425
Note: Legislation replaced by SF425
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to the manufacture, acquisition, sale, and use of firearms and suppressors, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill relating to the manufacture, acquisition, sale, and use of firearms and suppressors, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-03-03 | House | 12:30PM; RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult Judiciary. |
2015-03-02 | House | 12:30PM; RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult Judiciary. |
2015-03-02 | House | Judiciary: Windschitl Chair,Baltimore, and Wolfe. |
2015-03-02 | House | In Judiciary |
2015-03-02 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1251 (Related) 2015-03-05 - Voted - Judiciary.
HF527 (Replaced by) 2015-04-09 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 835.
SF425 (Replaced by) 2015-04-09 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 835.
HF527 (Replaced by) 2015-04-09 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 835.
SF425 (Replaced by) 2015-04-09 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 835.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB201 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB201.html |