IA HSB200 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF755

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 755.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act authorizing sports wagering on electronic sports events and other sports-related events.(See HF 755.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act authorizing sports wagering on electronic sports events and other sports-related events.(See HF 755.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 755.
2021-03-03HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 596.
2021-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
2021-02-11HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
2021-02-10HouseSubcommittee: Mitchell, Bloomingdale and Cohoon. H.J. 371.
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 370.
2021-02-10HouseBy COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

HF755 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 965.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback