IA HSB195 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pandemic relief by excluding certain COVID-19 related grants from the individual and corporate income taxes and allowing certain deductions relating to the paycheck protection program loan forgiveness, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pandemic relief by excluding certain COVID-19 related grants from the individual and corporate income taxes and allowing certain deductions relating to the paycheck protection program loan forgiveness, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 9:00AM House Lounge 1. |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Jacoby and Kaufmann. H.J. 371. |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 369. |
2021-02-10 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1198 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee: Smith, R., Jochum, and Sinclair.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB195 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB195.html |