IA HSB194 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF634
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 634.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 634.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to persons certified to conduct time-of-transfer inspections of private sewage disposal systems, and providing penalties.(See HF 634.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to persons certified to conduct time-of-transfer inspections of private sewage disposal systems, and providing penalties.(See HF 634.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 634. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 488. |
2023-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2023 9:30AM RM 304. |
2023-02-27 | House | Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2023 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Hayes and Levin. H.J. 383. |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 380. |
2023-02-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF634 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB194 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB194.html |