IA HSB190 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 805.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 805.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the establishment of first-time homebuyer savings accounts in Iowa, including related individual income tax exemptions, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the establishment of first-time homebuyer savings accounts in Iowa, including related individual income tax exemptions, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 805. |
2017-03-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-03-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/23/2017 1:00PM House Lounge |
2017-03-21 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, Rizer and McConkey. H.J. 757. |
2017-03-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SF425 (Replaced by) 2017-04-05 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF622 (Replaced by) 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
SF505 (Replaced by) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
SSB1056 (Related) 2017-02-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2017 4:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
HF622 (Replaced by) 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
SF505 (Replaced by) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
SSB1056 (Related) 2017-02-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2017 4:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB190 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB190.html |