IA HSB189 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF601
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to rate increase notice requirements for public utilities.(See HF 601.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to rate increase notice requirements for public utilities.(See HF 601.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 601. |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 485. |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2023 3:30PM House Lounge. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, P., Bloomingdale and Scholten. H.J. 383. |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 379. |
2023-02-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HF601 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 953.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB189 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB189.html |