IA HSB178 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to requirements and prohibitions relating to the reporting of vaccination and immunization administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to requirements and prohibitions relating to the reporting of vaccination and immunization administration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-23HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-02-22HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2023 8:30AM House Lounge 2.
2023-02-20HouseSubcommittee: Moore, T., Boden and Forbes. H.J. 374.
2023-02-20HouseIntroduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 373.
2023-02-20HouseBy COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback