IA HSB173 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF341
Note: Legislation replaced by HF561
Note: Legislation replaced by HF561
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 561.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 561.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the perfection of mechanics' liens and mechanics' liens remedies.(See HF 561.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the perfection of mechanics' liens and mechanics' liens remedies.(See HF 561.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 561. |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 397. |
2021-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 12:00PM House Lounge #1. |
2021-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 12:00PM House Lounge #1. |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Gustafson, Bohannan and Salmon. H.J. 283. |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 282. |
2021-02-02 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1006 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 341.
SF341 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 695.
HF561 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF341 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 695.
HF561 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB173 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB173.html |