IA HSB168 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF569
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A study bill relating to notice of garnishment and levy to a judgment debtor.
Title
A study bill relating to notice of garnishment and levy to a judgment debtor.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-03-02 | House | 1:30PM; House Lounge Judiciary. |
2015-02-24 | House | Judiciary: Gustafson Chair,Prichard, and Rizer. |
2015-02-24 | House | In Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF569 (Replaced by) 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 924.