IA HSB165 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF773

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 811.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing budget limitations for counties and cities and including applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing budget limitations for counties and cities and including applicability provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 811.
2019-03-13HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-03-11HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/13/2019 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
2019-03-06HouseSubcommittee reassigned: Hite, Bloomingdale, Brown-Powers, Forbes and Hein. H.J. 417.
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee: Bloomingdale, Brown-Powers, Forbes and Hein and Hite. H.J. 290.
2019-02-13HouseBy COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS

Same As/Similar To

HF773 (Replaced by) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback