IA HSB160 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF551
Note: Legislation replaced by SF440
Note: Legislation replaced by SF440
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to interstate contracts for substance abuse and mental health care and treatment.
Title
A study bill relating to interstate contracts for substance abuse and mental health care and treatment.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Voted - Human Resources. |
2015-02-26 | House | 12:00PM; House Lounge Human Resources. |
2015-02-19 | House | Human Resources: Miller Chair,Gaines, and Wills. |
2015-02-19 | House | In Human Resources |
2015-02-19 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1200 (Related) 2015-03-04 - Voted - Human Resources.
HF551 (Replaced by) 2015-03-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 600.
SF440 (Replaced by) 2015-03-31 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 756.
HF551 (Replaced by) 2015-03-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 600.
SF440 (Replaced by) 2015-03-31 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 756.