IA HSB145 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF579
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A study bill relating to the regulation of health care facilities, elder group homes, assisted living programs, and adult day services programs.
Title
A study bill relating to the regulation of health care facilities, elder group homes, assisted living programs, and adult day services programs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Voted - Human Resources. |
2015-03-02 | House | 1:00PM; House Lounge Human Resources. |
2015-02-17 | House | Human Resources: Best Chair,Bacon, and Winckler. |
2015-02-17 | House | In Human Resources |
2015-02-17 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF579 (Replaced by) 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 924.