IA HSB143 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF332
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 332.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 332.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the disposition of real property belonging to the state by the director of the department of administrative services.(See HF 332.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the disposition of real property belonging to the state by the director of the department of administrative services.(See HF 332.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 332. |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 361. |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2023 12:00PM RM 304. |
2023-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Wills, J., Harris and Srinivas. H.J. 261. |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 259. |
2023-02-07 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1083 (Related) 2023-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
HF332 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
HF332 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB143 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB143.html |