IA HSB143 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF532
Note: Legislation replaced by SF426
Note: Legislation replaced by SF426
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to privileged communications between a physician or health facility and a patient following an adverse health care incident.
Title
A study bill relating to privileged communications between a physician or health facility and a patient following an adverse health care incident.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-03-02 | House | 4:00PM; House Lounge Judiciary. |
2015-02-18 | House | Judiciary: Kaufmann Chair,Baltimore, and Wolfe. |
2015-02-17 | House | In Judiciary |
2015-02-17 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1176 (Related) 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
HF532 (Replaced by) 2015-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 763.
SF426 (Replaced by) 2015-04-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 865.
HF532 (Replaced by) 2015-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 763.
SF426 (Replaced by) 2015-04-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 865.