IA HSB139 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF634
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain boards and councils in the department of human rights including the establishment of the justice advisory board and the elimination of the criminal and juvenile justice planning advisory council, the public safety advisory board, and the sex offender research council.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain boards and councils in the department of human rights including the establishment of the justice advisory board and the elimination of the criminal and juvenile justice planning advisory council, the public safety advisory board, and the sex offender research council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 366. |
2019-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 9:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Kurth and Worthan. H.J. 253. |
2019-02-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF634 (Replaced by) 2019-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB139 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB139.html |