IA HSB123 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF2291
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2547

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2291.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to midwife licensure, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2291, HF 2547.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to midwife licensure, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2291, HF 2547.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2291.
2022-02-03HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 185.
2022-01-26HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2022 5:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
2022-01-25HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 5:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled).
2022-01-25HouseSubcommittee reassigned: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale, Lundgren, Mascher and Winckler. H.J. 118.
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale, Konfrst, Lundgren and Mascher. H.J. 177.
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 174.
2021-01-21HouseBy COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

HF2291 (Replaced by) 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 504.
HF2547 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 622.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback