IA HSB123 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF119

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Passed subcommittee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the obtaining of a copy of an original birth certificate by an adult adoptee, and providing for fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the obtaining of a copy of an original birth certificate by an adult adoptee, and providing for fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23HousePassed subcommittee.
2017-02-21HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 4:30PM House Lounge
2017-02-20HouseSubcommittee: Salmon, Dolecheck and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 428.
2017-02-20HouseBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

HF119 (Replaced by) 2017-01-26 - Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 127.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback