IA HSB120 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF368
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the reimbursement for rent constituting property taxes paid and related matters and including effective date provisions.(See HF 368.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the reimbursement for rent constituting property taxes paid and related matters and including effective date provisions.(See HF 368.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 368. |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 287. |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 8:00AM Law Library. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Gjerde and Graber. H.J. 177. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 174. |
2021-01-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1123 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Bolkcom, and Green.
HF368 (Replaced by) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.
HF368 (Replaced by) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB120 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB120.html |