IA HSB118 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF524
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 387.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 387.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle accidents resulting in injury or death, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 524.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle accidents resulting in injury or death, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 524.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 387. |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 8:00AM RM 19. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee: Bradley, Meyer, B. and Thorup. H.J. 177. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 174. |
2021-01-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HF524 (Replaced by) 2021-06-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB118 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB118.html |