IA HSB114 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the nonvoting membership of the Iowa workforce development board.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the nonvoting membership of the Iowa workforce development board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee: Deyoe, Bush and Cahill. H.J. 177. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Labor. H.J. 173. |
2021-01-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1099 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB114 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB114.html |