IA HSB114 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF471
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 465.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 465.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to allowable precinct consolidations completed by a county commissioner of elections.
Title
A bill for an act relating to allowable precinct consolidations completed by a county commissioner of elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 465. |
2017-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 1:30PM House Lounge |
2017-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 9:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled) |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Hein, Koester and Winckler. H.J. 317. |
2017-02-15 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF471 (Replaced by) 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1009.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB114 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB114.html |