IA HSB107 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF162
Note: Legislation replaced by SF359
Note: Legislation replaced by SF359
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 12:30PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 12:30PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the charging procedure for scheduled violations for exceeding weight limits on an axle or vehicle.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the charging procedure for scheduled violations for exceeding weight limits on an axle or vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Meyer, B. and Nordman. H.J. 207. |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 205. |
2023-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF162 (Replaced by) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 359. S.J. 398.
SF359 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1003.
SF359 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1003.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB107 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB107.html |