IA HSB103 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF232
Note: Legislation replaced by HF650
Note: Legislation replaced by HF650
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 650.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 650.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to notice requirements for abandoned vehicles taken into custody by a police authority or private entity.(See HF 650.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to notice requirements for abandoned vehicles taken into custody by a police authority or private entity.(See HF 650.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 650. |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 491. |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 12:30PM Law Library. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee: Thorup, Bradley and Cohoon. H.J. 176. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 172. |
2021-01-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1025 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 232.
SF232 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HF650 (Replaced by) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
SF232 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HF650 (Replaced by) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB103 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB103.html |