IA HJR9 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 8:30AM Law Library.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 8:30AM Law Library.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution calling for an Article V convention in order to propose amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints, and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and requesting Congress to similarly propose such amendments.
Title
A joint resolution calling for an Article V convention in order to propose amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints, and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and requesting Congress to similarly propose such amendments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 8:30AM Law Library. |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Bohannan and Bossman. H.J. 383. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 303. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR8 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee reassigned: Zaun, Boulton, and Schultz. S.J. 119.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HJR9 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HJR9.html |