IA HJR5 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa that the Constitution of the State of Iowa does not recognize, grant, or secure a right to abortion or require the public funding of abortion. (Formerly HSB 41.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa that the Constitution of the State of Iowa does not recognize, grant, or secure a right to abortion or require the public funding of abortion. (Formerly HSB 41.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Shall the resolution be adopted? (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - Shall amendment H–1011 be adopted? (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - Shall amendment H–1012 be adopted? (Y: 43 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - Shall amendment H–1013 be adopted? (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - Shall amendment H–1014 be adopted? (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - Shall the joint resolution be adopted and agreed to? (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28HouseFiscal note.
2021-05-19HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Secretary of State H.J. 1208.
2021-05-19HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1177.
2021-05-19SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1121.
2021-05-19SenatePassed Senate, yeas 30, nays 18. S.J. 1120.
2021-05-19SenateSenate concurred with S-3238. S.J. 1119.
2021-05-18SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3238. S.J. 1109.
2021-05-18HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1168.
2021-05-18HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 1168.
2021-05-18HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 1168.
2021-05-18HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 1168.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1206.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1200.
2021-05-18HousePassed House, yeas 54 nays 38. H.J. 1168.
2021-05-18HouseHouse concurred as House amended. H.J. 1166.
2021-05-18HouseAmendments H-1367, H-1368, H-1369 and H-1370 all to Senate amendment H-1357 out of order. H.J. 1166.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1200.
2021-05-18HouseAmendment H-1525 to Senate amendment H-1357 adopted. H.J. 1166.
2021-05-18HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 1165.
2021-05-18HouseAmendment H-1525 filed. H.J. 1165.
2021-04-07HouseAmendments H-1367, H-1368, H-1369 and H-1370 filed. H.J. 917.
2021-04-07HouseSenate amendment H-1357 filed. H.J. 917.
2021-04-07HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 896.
2021-04-06SenateImmediate message. S.J. 752.
2021-04-06SenatePassed Senate, yeas 30, nays 17. S.J. 752.
2021-04-06SenateAmendment S-3128 filed, adopted. S.J. 751.
2021-04-06SenateSubstituted for SJR 2. S.J. 751.
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 726.
2021-02-10SenateAttached to similar SJR 2. S.J. 306.
2021-02-02SenateRead first time, passed on file. S.J. 209.
2021-02-02SenateMessage from House. S.J. 209.
2021-01-27HouseImmediate message. H.J. 221.
2021-01-28HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 253.
2021-01-27HousePassed House, yeas 55, nays 44. H.J. 220.
2021-01-27HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 220.
2021-01-28HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 253.
2021-01-27HouseAmendment H-1014 lost. H.J. 219.
2021-01-28HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 253.
2021-01-27HouseAmendment H-1013 lost. H.J. 218.
2021-01-28HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 253.
2021-01-27HouseAmendment H-1012 lost. H.J. 218.
2021-01-28HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 253.
2021-01-27HouseAmendment H-1011 lost. H.J. 217.
2021-01-27HousePoint of order raised on H-1011, point withdrawn. H.J. 216.
2021-01-26HouseAmendments H-1013 and H-1014 filed. H.J. 205.
2021-01-26HouseAmendments H-1011 and H-1012 filed. H.J. 204.
2021-01-26HouseFiscal note.
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 180.

Same As/Similar To

HSB41 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 5.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HJR5
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HJR5.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/89/attachments/HJR5.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1210436.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1221615.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210127_HJNL.pdf#220
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210127_HJNL.pdf#219
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210127_HJNL.pdf#218
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210127_HJNL.pdf#217
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210127_HJNL.pdf#216
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210406_SJNL.pdf#752

Bill Comments 750

feedback