IA HJR12 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Sponsor added, Sunde. H.J. 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Sponsor added, Sunde. H.J. 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to a clean environment.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to a clean environment.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Isenhart [D] | Rep. Art Staed [D] | Rep. Timi Brown-powers [D] | Rep. Sharon Steckman [D] |
Rep. Bruce Hunter [D] | Rep. Marti Anderson [D] | Sen. Cindy Winckler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Sponsor added, Sunde. H.J. 595. |
2022-03-15 | House | Sponsors added, Forbes and McConkey. H.J. 582. |
2022-01-10 | House | Sponsor added, Cahill. H.J. 45. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 999. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HJR12 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HJR12.html |