IA HJR12 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution calling for an Article V convention in order to propose amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints, and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and requesting Congress to similarly propose such amendments. (Formerly HJR 11.)
Title
A joint resolution calling for an Article V convention in order to propose amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints, and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and requesting Congress to similarly propose such amendments. (Formerly HJR 11.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 689. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Committee of the Whole. S.J. 688. |
2017-04-22 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 1134. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SJR 8. S.J. 649. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 649. |
2017-03-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 654. |
2017-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 666. |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 58 nays 38. H.J. 651. |
2017-03-15 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 650. |
2017-03-15 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 650. |
2017-03-15 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 650. |
2017-03-15 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 650. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 562. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR11 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.