IA HJR11 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 711.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 711.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the qualifications of electors.(Formerly HSB 143.)
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the qualifications of electors.(Formerly HSB 143.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - Shall the joint resolution be adopted and agreed to? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 711. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 682. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 682. |
2021-03-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 828. |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 794. |
2021-03-01 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 553. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB143 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 11.
SSB1134 (Related) 2021-02-15 - Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Dawson.
SSB1134 (Related) 2021-02-15 - Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Dawson.