IA HF96 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the date for an election to authorize the issuance of certain indebtedness by school districts.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the date for an election to authorize the issuance of certain indebtedness by school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | House | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2021 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2021-02-03 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Bacon and Donahue. H.J. 289. |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 112. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF96 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF96.html |