IA HF94 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 580.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 580.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act eliminating a requirement that taxpayers indicate on their tax returns the presence or absence of health care coverage for their dependent children and apply for certain public health care coverage, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (See Cmte. Bill HF 2442)
Title
A bill for an act eliminating a requirement that taxpayers indicate on their tax returns the presence or absence of health care coverage for their dependent children and apply for certain public health care coverage, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (See Cmte. Bill HF 2442)
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Heartsill [R] | Rep. Guy Linden [R] | Rep. John Kooiker [R] | Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
Rep. Ralph Watts [R] | Sen. Sandy Salmon [R] | Rep. Thomas Sands [R] | Rep. Steven Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 580. |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-04-02 | House | Subcommittee, L. Miller, Maxwell, and Steckman. H.J. 748. |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 146. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HF94 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF94.html |