IA HF892 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the redemption of beverage containers, providing civil penalties, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 872, HF 814, HSB 252.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the redemption of beverage containers, providing civil penalties, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 872, HF 814, HSB 252.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1203. |
2021-04-30 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2021-04-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 1030. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB252 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 814.
HF814 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 872.
HF872 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 892. H.J. 1032.
HF814 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 872.
HF872 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 892. H.J. 1032.