IA HF889 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the mandatory disclosure of whether a person has received a vaccination for COVID-19, disqualifying certain entities from receiving state grants or contracts, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 05/20/2021.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the mandatory disclosure of whether a person has received a vaccination for COVID-19, disqualifying certain entities from receiving state grants or contracts, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 05/20/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Shall amendment H–1431 be adopted? (Y: 43 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - Shall amendment H–1421 be adopted? (Y: 9 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Shall amendment H–1431 be adopted? (Y: 43 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - Shall amendment H–1421 be adopted? (Y: 9 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212. |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-05-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1042. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1028. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 16. S.J. 1027. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Substituted for SF 610. S.J. 1027. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 610. S.J. 1020. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1020. |
2021-04-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1031. |
2021-05-06 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1076. |
2021-04-29 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1034. |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed House, yeas 58, nays 35. H.J. 1028. |
2021-04-28 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1027. |
2021-04-28 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1433. H.J. 1027. |
2021-04-28 | House | Point of order raised on H-1433, ruled not germane. H.J. 1027. |
2021-04-28 | House | Amendment H-1433 filed. H.J. 1027. |
2021-04-29 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1034. |
2021-04-28 | House | Amendment H-1421, yeas 9, nays 85, filed, lost. H.J. 1026. |
2021-04-28 | House | Amendment H-1424 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1026. |
2021-04-29 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1034. |
2021-04-28 | House | Amendment H-1431, yeas 43, nays 50, filed, lost. H.J. 1025. |
2021-04-28 | House | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 1024. |
2021-04-28 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration. H.J. 1024. |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1003. |
2021-04-26 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Bohannan, Gustafson, Hansen, Hite, Jacobsen, Kaufmann, Klein, Lohse, Meyer, B., Mitchell, Oldson, Olson, Osmundson, Salmon, Wessel-Kroeschell, Westrich, Wheeler, Wilburn, Wills and Wolfe. H.J. 1003. |
2021-04-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1002. |
Same As/Similar To
SF610 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1028.